Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brown, Christopher, Brown, Amanda, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rosencranz, Esq., Dana Michael, against Lessard, Stephen J, represented by Harris, Esq., Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2013 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs | |
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER approving settlement. (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Copies mailed 2/26/13 | |
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion (P#2) After hearing, review of petition and affidavit of Delores Burroughs-Biron, ALLOWED & Approved (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Notices mailed 2/26/2013 | |
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Delores Burroghs-Biron | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition for Approval of Settlement with a minor ; Affidavit of Jonathan Harris in support | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type A99, Track F. | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.