Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nieves, Sonia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bunnell, Esq., Patrick R, against Filipinas, Jocelyn, Filipinas, Jerry, represented by Caiazzi, Esq., Elizabeth C, Harding, Esq., Ronald E, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2013 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs, and waiving the rights of appeal. | |
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation of partial dismissal as to Jocelyn Filipinas, with prejudice, without costs | |
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance (re: complaint ) | |
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Jocelyn Filipinas(Defendant) 1-29-13(certified mail) | |
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Jerry Filipinas(Defendant) 1-29-13 (certified mail) | |
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Jerry Filipinas(Defendant) - cj | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type B03, Track F. | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed - CJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.