Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Winter, Howard T, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Mahoney, Esq., Michael Francis, against Cancelmo, Helene A, Ecu And Us International, represented by Potash, Esq., Howard J, Montgomery, Esq., Peter E, Brody, Esq., Richard Eric, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with David Ricciardone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Ricciardone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2013 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Status Review scheduled for 05/21/2015 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled Appeared: | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs as to 's be dismissed with prejudice and without costs. All rights of appeal are waived | |
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 5/6/2015 (David Ricciardone, Justice) | |
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER (amended complaint): Deft Helene A Cancelmo- CJ | |
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Amended complaint of Plf Howard T Winter- CJ | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#14) ALLOWED, unopposed. (David Ricciardone, Justice) Notices mailed 9/26/2014 | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Plff's. Howard T. Winter motion to amend complaint, affid. of compiance with Sup. Court Rule & request for hearing | |
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Tracking deadlines amended: Plaintiff's Motion to extend tracking order - ALLOWED - Changed in Headder | |
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#12) ALLOWED (Richard T. Tucker, Justice) Notices mailed 6/13/2014 | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of attorney's lien filed by E Peter Mullane |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.