Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pexco Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kaufman, Esq., Paul S, against Bouvier, Ronald, Ex U Rope Inc, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2013 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Execution Issued: Alias / Successor Execution Judgment Debtor: Ex U Rope Inc / Bouvier, Ronald Judgment Creditor: Pexco LLC Terms of Execution: EXON Issuance Date: 11/27/2015 Judgment Total: 51,031.89 Post Judgment Costs: 805.30 Post Judgment Int. Rate: .12 Post Judgment Int. Total: 15,798.91 Execution Subtotal: 66,830.80 Execution Total: 67,636.10 | |
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for execution Applies To: Pexco LLC (Plaintiff) | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ALIAS Execution Issued: Execution Judgment Debtor: Ex U Rope Inc / Bouvier, Ronald Judgment Creditor: Pexco LLC Terms of Execution: EXON Issuance Date: 11/06/2015 Judgment Total: 51,031.89 Post Judgment Costs: 805.30 Post Judgment Int. Rate: .12 Post Judgment Int. Total: 15,446.33 Execution Subtotal: 66,478.22 Execution Total: 67,283.52 | |
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Alias Execution (#9.0): ALLOWED as requested. | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Party's MOTION for Alias Execution; Affidavit; Certificate of Compliance; Document List Applies To: Pexco LLC (Plaintiff) | |
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Execution issued for plaintiff(s) v Ex U Rope Inc, Ronald Bouvier in amount of $51,837.22, including interest and costs, issued to plaintiff(s) Attorney Paul S Kaufman | |
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for execution | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Default judgment (55b2). It is Ordered and Adjudged: that the plaintiff recover of the defendants the sum of $45,553.98, plus interest in the sum of $3,644.00, attorneys fees in the sum of $1,500.00 and the costs of this action. (Daniel M Wrenn, Justice) Entered and copies mailed 5/1/13 | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date. Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Unassigned Judgment For: Pexco LLC Judgment Against: Ex U Rope Inc / Bouvier, Ronald Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 04/30/2013 Jdgmnt Date: 04/30/2013 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 49197.98 Filing Fees: 333.91 Crt Ord Atty Fee: 1500.00 Further Orders: Information prior to conversion: Damage Amount: 49,197.98 Interest rate: 12.00 Damage Interest Amount: 0.00 Damage Total Amount: 49,197.98 Costs of Action Amount: 333.91 Attorney's Fees Amount: 1,500.00 Punitive Amount: Judgement Total Amount: 51,031.89 Execution Interest Amount: 805.33 Non-interest Costs Amount: Execution Total Amount: 51,837.22 Judgment Total: 51,031.89 Execution entered on 11/06/2015 | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion (P#6) ALLOWED (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Notices mailed 5/1/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.