Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Smith Jr, Kenneth, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Corso, Esq., Frank C, against Kimball, Janet, represented by Han, Esq., Young B, Cohen, Esq., Adam G, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet Kenton-Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2013 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Pursuant to MRCP 41 (a)(1)(ii), all parties to the aboce entitled actions hereby stipulate that these cases, including all claims, cross-claims and counterclaims asserted or capable of being asserted herein, be dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. The parties further waive all rights to appeal and all other rights of recourse from these dismissals. | |
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 8/10/2014 (James R. Lemire, Justice (RAJ)) | |
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#5) ALLOWED (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) Notices mailed 5/13/2014 | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | JOINT Motion of parties to Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 6/24/2014 | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Janet Kimball(Defendant) & cj | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Uniform Counsel Certification filed by Defendant's, attorney Adam G. Cohen, Young B Han | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Janet Kimball(Defendant) 1/23/13 (last and usual) | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type B04, Track F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.