Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mitchell, Stephanie L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Smith, Esq., Gregory T, against Desko, Erin, represented by Horn, Esq., John M, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2013 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | The parties hereby stipulate the above matter may be dismissed pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii) as to all claims with prejudice and without costs or interest. | |
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#6) ALLOWED, Pre Trial Conference reschedule to 9-9-2014 at 2:00pm in room 20. (James R. Lemire, Justice (RAJ)) Notices mailed 7/11/2014 | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Defendant Erin Desko's MOTION for to Continue Pre-Trial Conference, assented to by Stephanie L Mitchell | |
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 6/24/2014 | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#5) DENIED. The Court will consider the matter or sanctions should plaintiff's fail to appear for deposition on 5/22/2014. (Robert B. Gordon, Justice) Notices mailed 3/25/2014 | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Defendant Erin Desko's Motion of Deft for Order Compelling Plff to Attend Her Deposition and for Dismissal Should See Fail to Attend; Plff Stephanie L. Mitchell's Response in Opposition to Deft's Motion to Compel Deposition; Affidavit of Compliance; Notice of Filing; List of Documents | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Erin Desko's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer medical bills as evidence, pursuant to MGLc 233, sec 79G | |
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Erin Desko(Defendant) & cj | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Erin Desko(Defendant) 1-10-13 (last and usual place of abode) | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.