Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Comm Of Mass, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Ludwig, Esq., Glenn Allan, against $480.00, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2013 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT; It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: 1. That the Defendant $480.00 in US Currency, seized on November 24, 2011, is hereby forfeited as to the interested party, Daniel Murphy; 2. That of the defendant, $480.00 in US Currency, the amount of $240.00 be forfeited to the Comm of Mass through the District Attorney's Office for the middle District to be used for education, investigation and prosecution of cases and the use thereof as provided for under G.L. c. 94C, sec. 47; 3.The balance in the amount of $240.00 be forfeited to the Paxton Police Department to be used for the same purposes as stated above. 4. This Judgment forfeits any and all inrterests that Daniel Murphy may have in the defendant. (see judgment) (James R. Lemire, Justice (RAJ)), Entered and Copies mailed 2/26/2013. | |
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion (P#6) ALLOWED (James R. Lemire, Justice (RAJ)) Notices mailed 2/26/2013 | |
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Comm of Mass's MOTION for judgment of default against Daniel Murphy | |
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant(s) Daniel Murphy. Copies mailed 2/15/2013 | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Daniel Murphy is not in military service | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Daniel Murphy by Comm of Mass & Affidavit in support | |
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Daniel Mirphy, service made on 2/12/2013 | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type E95, Track F. | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Comm of Mass pursuant to M G L c 94C, Sec. 47 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.