Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Comm Of Mass, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Flannery, Esq., Patricia, against 2000 Ford Mustang Coupe, $1,832.00, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet Kenton-Walker Track Judgeโs New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2013 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT; It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: 1. That the 0defendant 2000 Ford Mustand ID No. 1FAFP4048YF247443, seized on June 18, 2012, to be forfeited to the Comm of Mass through the District Attorney's Office for the Middle District to be held and utilized by the Massachusetts State Police for education, investigation and prosecution of cases and the use thereof as provided for under G.L. Chapter 94C, Section 47, including sale at public auction or by other means of competitive bidding. 2. Said Judgment forfeits any and all interests of Sharon A. Bates and Rafael Rebollo in the above vehicle. 3. That the defendant $1,832.00 in US Currency, seized on June 18, 2012 is hereby forfeited as to the interested parties, Sharon A. Bates and Rafael Rebollo; 4. That the defendant, $1,832.00 in US Currency be forfeited to the Comm of Mass through the District Attorney's office for the middle district to be used for education, investigation and prosecution of cases and the use thereof as provided for under G.L. c. 94C, sec.47; 5. This Judgment forfeits any and all interests that Sharon A. Bates and Rafael Rebollo may have in the Defendant. (see order). ( James R. Lemire, Justice (RAJ)), Entered and Copies mailed 2/12/2013 | |
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion (P#7) ALLOWED (James R. Lemire, Justice (RAJ)) Notices mailed 2/12/2013 | |
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Comm of Mass's MOTION for judgment of default against Sharon A Bates, Rafael Rebollo | |
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant Sharon A Bates, Rafael Rebollo. Copies mailed 2/6/2013 | |
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Sharon A Bates, Rafael Rebollo by Comm of Mass & Affidavit in support | |
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Sharon A Bates, Rafael Rebollo are not in military service | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Tracking deadlines amended: Commonwealth's motion to amend track designation, ALLOWED. changed in header and tracking order mailed 12-20-2012. | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#2) ALLOWED (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) Notices mailed 12/20/2012 | |
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Sharon A Bates, Rafael Rebollo, service made on 12/17/2012 | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Comm of Mass's MOTION to amend track Designation from "FAST" to "AVERAGE" ; Memo in Support Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.