Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ciesluick, Tonia L, Quinones, Netjaliz, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gentile, Esq., Cherele L, against Pilgrim Insurance Company, represented by Moynihan, Esq., James John, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2013 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice and without costs. Notices mailed 8/25/14 | |
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Pleading, Voluntary Dismissal, returned to Cherele L Gentile, Esq., for Plfs Netjaliz Quinones, & Tonia L Ciesluick.: Must be filed by a stipulation of dismissal with signatures from both counsel. | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER appointing arbitrator Amy Kropke (Shannon Frison, Justice) Copies mailed 5/14/13 | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs review for answers' at service deadline review | |
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Pilgrim Insurance Company(Defendant) | |
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Pilgrim Insurance Company(Defendant)1-10-13 (agent person in charge) | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion (P#2) ALLOWED (Lemire J RAJ Justice) Notices mailed 1/7/2013 | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Plffs' MOTION for appointment of special process server Francis Trapasso | |
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. | |
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type B03, Track F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.