Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Xpedx, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Riseberg, Esq., Michael D, against Ameridose Llc, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet Kenton-Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2012 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) without prejudice of all claims | |
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 1/19/2013 (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (order of notice): Middlesex Savings Bank 12-12-12 (agent person in charge) | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (order of notice): Ameridose LLC12-12-12 (agent person in charge) | |
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Plff xpedx's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Memo in support of Motion | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#3) Summons and Order of Notice to issue, returnable 12-20-2012 at 2:00pm in room 20. (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice). Notices mailed 12/10/2012 | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#2) ALLOWED (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) Notices mailed 12/10/2012 | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate Regarding Liability Insurance | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Xpedx's ex parte MOTION for attachment trustee process ; Certificate Regarding Liability Insurance | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Xpedx's MOTION for appointment of special process server Dewsnap and Associates LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.