Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Collins, James F, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Radigan, Esq., Douglas Thomas, Nguyen, Esq., Aivi, Angelini, Esq., Michael P, against Visimark Inc, Lunden, Kari R, represented by Badger, Esq., Michael D, Van Nostrand, Esq., Richard C, Christy, Esq., Michael Richard, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet Kenton-Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2010 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs, and waiving all rights of appeal. | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 3/17/2011 (John S. McCann, Justice) | |
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Deft Kari R Lunden's memo in Opposition to Plf James F Collins's motion in limine to sanction, Affidavit of Richard C. Van Nostrand in opposition to Plf's motion in limine to sanction, & Affidavit of Michael R. Christy in opposition to Plf's motion in limine to sanction | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Plaintiff James F Collins's MOTION in limine to sanction Defts' fraud on the Court and spoilation of evidence, Plf's memo in support of motion in limine to sanction Defts' fraud on the Court and spoilation of evidence, Appendix to memorandum in support of motion in limine to sanction Defts' fraud on the Court and spoilation of evidence, Affidavit of Michael P. Angelini, request for hearing, & cert of service. | |
November 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Copy of Letter Rogatory - Original to Atty Angelini 11/8/10 (John S. McCann, Justice) | |
November 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#24) ALLOWED (John S. McCann, Justice) Notices mailed 11/8/2010 | |
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#23) After hearing with all parties present motion is ALLOWED. An evidentiary hearing is set for 12/20/10 @ 9:00 (John S. McCann, Justice) Notices mailed 11/2/2010 | |
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Plaintiff James F Collins's MOTION for Letter Rogatory, Affidavit of compliance with Rule 9A, & cert of service. | |
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Atty AiVi Nguyen's notice of appearance for Plf James F Collins | |
October 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Plff's Motion for evidentiary Hearing on his request for a Preliminary Injunction; Deft Kari R Lunden's Opposition to Motion & Affidavit of Compliance with Sup Court Rule 9A filed by Att Michael P Angelini |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.