Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marathon Asset Investment Trust 2007-1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Manchini, Esq., Steven G, Caponigro, Esq., Stephanie, Califano, Esq., Amanda L., against Holden, Robin L, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2010 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL re: Robin L Holden; service not complete by deadline. It is Ordered and Adjudged: that the complaint is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (John T Lu, Justice) Entered and copies mailed 6/9/10 | |
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#3) ALLOWED provided that the return date shall be April 6, 2010 (Mitchell H. Kaplan, Justice) Notices mailed 2/10/2010 | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Plff's Motion for new Order of Notice to February 17,2010 | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice to publish foreclosure in the Item rec notice in the Worcester District Registry of Deeds and by regular mail return at Worcester 02-17-2010 (McCann,J) | |
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Mortgagee's Affidavit notice has been sent because it is required under Section 11(e) of Chapter 206 of the Acts of 2007 | |
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275.00 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. | |
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type C04, Track X. | |
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint to foreclose a mortgage & civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.