Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mercarter, Joyce, Farnsworth, Judith, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Mestre, Esq., Ray, against Nationstar Mortgage, represented by Swisher, Esq., Meredith Ann, Stetson, Iii, Esq., Robert William, Fox, Esq., James B, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2010 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal under MRCP Rue 41(a)(l)(ii) is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs. copies mailed 9/10/12 | |
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Joint pre-trial memorandum filed in court | |
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#17) DENIED (James R. Lemire, Justice (RAJ)) Notices mailed 7/11/2012 | |
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Atty. Andrea V. Lasker withdrawal of appearance filed re: deft. Nationstar Mortgage | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Atty James B Fox's notice of appearance for Nationstar Mortgage | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Defendant's Assented to MOTION to extend Tracking Order and Reschedule Final Pre Trial Conference | |
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Tracking deadlines amended: Motion to extend track - All'd; changed in header; Copies mailed 3/21/12 | |
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#16) ALLOWED, final pre-trial conference to go forward 7/17/12 (Daniel Wrenn, Justice) Notices mailed 3/21/2012 | |
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 7/17/2012 | |
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Joint motion to extend tracking order and reschule final pre-trial conference (pre trial currently scheduled for March 13, 2012 to July 17, 2012) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.