Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perry Flynn, Stacey, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Crowe, Jr., Esq., Philip J, against Phillips Cst, Mary Jean, Tosches Rn, Louise, Thomas N Maki Md, represented by Faggiano, Esq., John Patrick, Cooledge, Esq., Christine D, Capplis, Esq., Sean Eric, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2012 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs to all defendants. | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 11/25/2013 (Robert L. Ullmann, Justice) Copies mailed 10/25/13 | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion (P#61) DENIED (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Notices mailed 2/1/2013 | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Defendant Thomas N Maki MD's MOTION to compel the Massachusetts Board of Registration in Medicine to produce any and all records regarding Ralph Cahaly MD | |
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#59) ALLOWED (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Notices mailed 11/6/2012 | |
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Defendant Louise Tosches Rn, Mary Jean Phillips CST's MOTION for Court Order for Medical Records ; Affidavit of Richard F chesolfska ; List of Documents ; Certificate of Service; | |
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#48) ALLOWED (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Notices mailed 9/14/2012 | |
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Mary Jean Phillips CST Motion for Courts Orders for medical Records; certificate of service; affidavit of Rule 9A | |
August 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#47) ALLOWED (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Notices mailed 8/27/2012 | |
August 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for trial by jury on 11/15/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.