Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Onewest Bank Fsb, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Rosenman, Esq., Carrie Berenson, against Dues, Andrelino S, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet Kenton-Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2010 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATORY JUDGMENT and ORDER - (see judgment) (Kenton-Walker, J) Entered and Copies mailed 2/2/10 | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#13) ALLOWED (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) Notices mailed 2/2/2010 | |
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Plaintiff OneWest Bank FSB's MOTION for final declaratory judgment against Andrelino S Dues, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, & Citibank Federal Savings Bank, & cert of service. | |
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendants Andrelino S Dues, & Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. The Plf shall file a motion for an assessment of damages and default judgment pursuant to MRCP 55(b)2 and subject to MRCP 54(b) and 55(b)4 as amended by 2/18/2010. Copies mailed 1/21/2010 | |
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc by OneWest Bank FSB | |
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Andrelino S Dues by OneWest Bank FSB | |
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (order of notice): Andrelino S Dues, service made on 12/22/09 (last and usual) | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (order of notice): Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. Service made on 12/21/09 (agent/person in charge) filed in Court | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Findings and Order for Approval of attachment in the amount of $320,000.00 as to Andrelino S Dues (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) Copies mailed 12/31/09 | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Findings on Motion for Lis Pendens (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) Copies mailed 12/31/09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.