Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Td Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Goldberg, Esq., David S, against Dodge, Brian J, Royal Oak Builders Inc, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2010 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Execution returned satisfied in full | |
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Execution issued for plaintiff(s) v Royal Oak Builders Inc, Brian J Dodge in amount of $34,265.92, including interest and costs, issued to plaintiff(s) Attorney David S Goldberg | |
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for execution | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Default judgmnt (55b1) by clerk v defendants Royal Oak Builders Inc, & Brian J Dodge. It is hereby ordered: Judgment for the Plf on default of the Plf for failure to plead or otherwise defend against the complaint, in the amount of $32,776.80 plus interest from 12/17/2009 in the sum of $721.99 and its costs of action. Copies mailed 2/26/2010 | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk for default judgment (55b1) re: TD Bank, a/k/a DMP Construction Supply Inc, d/b/a Pelletier's Building Supply Co Inc by Royal Oak Builders Inc, & Brian J Dodge, & Attorney's fees waived | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Pleading, Request for Default Judgment 55(b)1, returned to David S Goldberg, Esq., for/or TD Bank.: Complaint seeks Atty's fees, Can not do a 55(b)1 unless fees are waived. | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendants Royal Oak Builders Inc, & Brian J Dodge. A motion for an assessment of damages and default judgment pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P.55(b)2 and subject to Mass.R.Civ.P.54(b) and 55(b)4 as amended by 3/4/10. Copies mailed 2/4/2010 | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Royal Oak Builders Inc, & Brian J Dodge by TD Bank, a/k/a DMP Construction Supply Inc, d/b/a Pelletier's Building Supply Co Inc | |
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Deft Royal Oak Builders Inc, service made on 1/8/2010 (agent in charge service) | |
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Deft Brian J Dodge, service made on 1/8/2010 (in hand) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.