Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Worcester Retirement Board, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Sacco, Esq., Michael, Rideout, Esq., Lane E, against Goodall, Elizabeth, Contributory Retirement Appeal Board, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Richard T. Tucker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard T. Tucker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2010 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Board's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings be DENIED. The CRAB's decision allowing accidental disability retirement benefits to Elizabeth Goodall is affirmed. Richard T. Tucker, Justice). Entered and Copies mailed 6/10/2011 | |
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings; it is hereby ORDERED that the Board's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings be DENIED. The CRAB's decision allowing accidental disability retirement benefits to Goodall is affirmed. (see memo of decision and order) (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice). Copies mailed 5-26-2011. | |
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#9) DENIED (see memo of decision) (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) Notices mailed 5/26/2011 | |
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Hearing on (P#9) Judgment on the pleadings held, matter taken under advisement. (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) | |
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Plff's MOTION for Judgment on pleadings; Plff's Memo of law supporting Motion; Response of Contributory Retirement Appeal Board to Motion & Deft Elizabeth Goodall's Memo of law in Opposition to Motion | |
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Administrative record filed by Deft Contributory Retirement Appeal Board | |
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#7) ALLOWED (John S. McCann, Justice) Notices mailed 11/3/2010 | |
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Assented to MOTION to postpone hearing scheduled for 12/14/10 | |
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order issued in action for Judicial Review of an Administrative Agency proceeding under G. L. C. 30A, Sec 14 for hearing on 12/14/2010 (John S. McCann, Justice) Copies mailed 9/24/2010 | |
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Court received Deft Contributory Retirement Appeal Board's notice of waiver of oral argument |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.