Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mcdowell, Leanne L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Laderoute, Esq., John F, against Courtesy Delivery Inc, Markovich, Marjan, represented by De Abreu, Esq., David O, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2013 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal: failure to comply with nisi order. It is Ordered and Adjudged: that the complaint, crossclaim, counterclaim and third party action be and hereby is dismissed under MRCP 41(b)(1) without prejudice (Shannon Frison, Justice). Entered and Copies mailed 11/1/2013 | |
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 10/20/2013 (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Copies mailed 8/22/13 | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Session assignment changed to Civil E - Courtroom 17 located at CtRm 17- 3rd fl (225 Main St.,Worcester) for all future activity. | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion (P#13) After further review, VACATE Denial of 12/31/12 & allow motion . (John S. McCann, Justice). Notices mailed 1/9/2013 | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#13) DENIED (John S. McCann, Justice) Notices mailed 12/31/2012 ENDORSEMENT VACATED on 1/3/13. See next entry. | |
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A. records bills notes and reports | |
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event | JOINT Motion of parties to Continue Trial | |
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Joint pre-trial memorandum filed in court. | |
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 7/17/2012 | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#10) ALLOWED (John S. McCann, Justice) Notices mailed 2/16/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.