Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pathi, Raj Valaya, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Kilroy, Esq., Robert L, Higgins, Esq., Corey F, against Prosser, John M, Bascuas, Joseph W, Becker College, represented by Smeallie, Esq., James D, Mitchell, Esq., Matthew L, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Richard T. Tucker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard T. Tucker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2010 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs and with all rights of appeal waived, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and expenses | |
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation EXTENDED to be filed by 8/24/2010 (Cornelius J. Moriarty, II, Justice) EXTENDED to be filed by 9/24/10. | |
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation EXTENDED and to be filed by 8/10/2010 (Richard T. Tucker, Justice) | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 7/10/2010 (Richard T. Tucker, Justice) Copies mailed 6/10/10 | |
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Defts' reply to plff's Opposition to defts' Motion to dismiss Counts II-III, IV of plff's first amended complaint and demand for Trial by Jury (P#6) | |
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#7) ALLOWED (Richard T. Tucker, Justice) Notices mailed 4/7/2010 | |
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Court received letter re: request for leave to file brief reply Memo in response to Plffs Opposition to Defts Motion to dismiss (Re#6) | |
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss (MRCP 12b) Counts II-III, IV, and VI of Plf's first amended complaint and demand for trial by jury, Memo in support of motion, Plf's opposition to Defts' motion to dismiss, Affidavit of compliance under Superior Court Rule 9A, Request for hearing, & cert of service | |
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Amended complaint of Raj Valaya Pathi & CJ | |
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Deft John M Prosser, service made on 12/10/2009 (accepted by counsel of record) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.