Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
North Brookfield Savings Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Berthiaume, Esq., Blaise P, against Blinn Executor, Michael E, Barzetti Executor, Shelly J, Blinn, Bonnie L, Blinn, Michael E, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2010 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) without prejudice | |
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Amended complaint of North Brookfield Savings Bank | |
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#3) ALLOWED Notices mailed 1/11/2010 | |
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Plff's Emergency Motion to amend complaint and issue a new Order of Notice | |
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice to publish foreclosure in the New Leader rec notice in the Worcester District Registry of Deeds and by regular mail return at Worcester 02-04-2010 (McCann,J) | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Mortgagee's Affidavit notice has been sent because it is required under Section 11(e) of Chapter 206 of the Acts of 2007 | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275.00 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type C04, Track X. | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint to foreclose a mortgage & civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.