We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Chase Bank Usa Na V Morrison

Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago ago

On December 04, 2009 a Other Contract Action case was filed by Chase Bank Usa Na, represented by Ballentine, Esq., James O, against Morrison, Jonathan W, represented by in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA.

Case Details

Filing Date

December 04, 2009

Last Refreshed

April 22, 2021

Filing Location

Worcester County, MA

Category

Contract / Business Cases

Parties

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event copy of Plaintiff s Affidavit of Damages sent to AG Office per their request ( #7)
Docket Event Default judgmnt (55b1) by clerk v defendant Jonathan W Morrison in amount of $29,458.08 plus interest from 12/04/2009 in the sum of $2,159.74 and its costs of action. Copies mailed 7/15/2010
Docket Event Plf Chase Bank USA NA's Affidavit of damages
Docket Event Request upon clerk for default judgment (55b1) re: Jonathan W Morrison by Chase blic-access-to-court-records/rule-xiii-uniform-trial-court-rules-for-civil-commitment-proceedings-for-alcohol-and-substance-use-disorders-g-l-c123-s35/rule-11-appeal/">Bank USA NA, memo of damages, & cert of service.
Docket Event Default (55a) as to defendant Jonathan W Morrison. The Plf shall file a request for Default Judgment pursuant to MRCP 55(b)1 and subject to MRCP 54(b) and 55(b)4 as amended by 8/12/10(contract-sum certain only). Copies mailed 7/13/2010
Docket Event Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Jonathan W Morrison by Chase blic-access-to-court-records/rule-xiii-uniform-trial-court-rules-for-civil-commitment-proceedings-for-alcohol-and-substance-use-disorders-g-l-c123-s35/rule-11-appeal/">Bank USA NA
Docket Event SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Jonathan W Morrison, service made on 2/9/2010 (last and usual)
Docket Event Uniform Counsel Certification filed by Plaintiff's, attorney James blic-access-to-court-records/rule-xiii-uniform-trial-court-rules-for-civil-commitment-proceedings-for-alcohol-and-substance-use-disorders-g-l-c123-s35/rule-11-appeal/">Ballentine
Docket Event Filing fee paid in the amount of $275 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee.
Docket Event Origin 1, Type A99, Track F.
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.