Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Board Of Trustees Of Lakeshore Condominium Trust, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Lennon, Esq., Dean T, Barresi, Esq., Paul Joseph, against Saulenas, Robert W, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2010 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal without prejudice | |
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant Robert W Saulenas. Copies mailed 2/18/2010 | |
February 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Robert W Saulenas a/k/a RW Saulenas by Board of Trustees of Lakeshore Condominium Trust & Affidavit of Att Dean T Lennon | |
February 17, 2010 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Ohio Savings Bank, service made on 1/13/2010 (certified mail) | |
February 17, 2010 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, service made on 1/12/2010 (agent in charge service) | |
February 17, 2010 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Robert W Saulenas(Defendant)01-11-2010 (last and usual place of abode) | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (P#3) DENIED for non compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A (John S. McCann, RAJ) Notices mailed 12/29/2009 | |
December 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Plff's MOTION for Summary Judgment, pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P. 56, as to deft Robert W Saulenas a/k/a R W Saulenas; Affidavit of Property Manager & Affidavit of Att Dean T Lennon | |
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER: AmTrust Bank a division of New York Community Bank f/k/a AmTrust Bank f/k/a Ohio Savings Bank | |
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Atty Ann Marie Maccarone's notice of appearance for Ohio Savings Bank |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.