Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pryce, Richard, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Provanzano, Esq., Joseph S, against Vazquez, Ivelise, represented by Delcuze, Esq., Stephen D, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts with Michael P. Doolin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Doolin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Defendants Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial
Date: November 16, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 07/25/2023 09:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Mary K Ames, Presiding Staff: Anh T Bungcayao, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Leontina Limone, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ames, Mary K |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 07/20/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Mary K Ames, Presiding Staff: Anh T Bungcayao, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Leontina Limone, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ames, Mary K |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 05/11/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Mary K Ames, Presiding Staff: Anh T Bungcayao, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Leontina Limone, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ames, Mary K |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Richard Pryce's Request to Admit or Deny Facts to be Answered under oath by the Defendant | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Application for Index of Request for Jury Instruction Applies To: Pryce, Richard (Plaintiff) | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Richard Pryce's Notice to Deem Plaintiff's Request for Admissions to Ivelise Vazquez Defendant Admitted | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Pursuant to Massachusetts General Laws Chapter 233, section 79G | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. On this date Stephen D Delcuze, Esq. added for Defendant Ivelise Vazquez | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. On this date Sheeroz F Kamran, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Ivelise Vazquez | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 03/02/2023 12:52:10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.