Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Santander Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Theodore, Esq., Michael H, against Reiss, Edivaldo A, United Service Group, Inc., represented by Nader, Esq., George J, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts with Rosemary Connolly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRosemary Connolly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 07, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 07, 2021Plaintiff Santander Bank, N.a.'s Motion to Appoint Quickserv as Special Process Server
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Your request for default against the defendant TD BANK NA pursuant to MRCP 55a has not been entered for the following reasons: Answer or Dispositive Motion Filed | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Santander Bank, N.a.'s Request for default as to the Trustee Defendant pursuant to Rule 55(a). Applies To: TD Bank NA (Trustee Defendant) | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Received from Trustee Defendant TD Bank NA: Answered; | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Applies To: TD Bank NA (Trustee Defendant) | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: Finding and Ex Parte Order for Approval on Trustee Process Attachment (see P#25) (dated 2/8/23) notice sent 2/9/23 | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Ex Parte Attachment (Post Judgment) (#23.0): ALLOWED Based upon the Court's finding that the standard for ex parte relief under MRCP 4.2(g) has been met. Trustee Process in the amount of $563,119.45 shall issue as to all accounts of Edivaldo A Reis at TD Bank NA (dated 2/6/23) notice sent 2/9/23 | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings and Order for Approval of Plaintiff(s) Santander Bank, N.a.'s Ex Parte Motion for a Trustee Process as to Defendant(s) Edivaldo A Reiss in the hands of TD Bank NA and in the amount of $563,119.45 . Judge: Ullmann, Hon. Robert L | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Santander Bank, N.a.'s Motion for Ex Parte Attachment (Post Judgment) | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION entered on docket pursuant to Mass R Civ P 58(a) and notice sent to parties pursuant to Mass R Civ P 77(d) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.