Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Patterson, Alfred E., filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case represented by Castano, Esq., Michael R, against Acting Boston Mayor Kim Janey, Boston Police Commissioner, Gregory Long, Boston Police Department, Chan, City Of Boston, (total of 8) See All represented by Anjomi, Esq., Nieve, Bostwick, Esq., Elizabeth L, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 07, 2021Service Returned for Defendant City of Boston: Service through person in charge / agent;
Date: November 22, 2021Exhibits/Appendix Amended Complaint and Request for Trial by Jury
Date: February 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants Officer John Doe #2, Officer John Doe #1, City of Boston's Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's complaint pursuant to Mass. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants City of Boston, Officer John Doe #1, Officer John Doe #2's Memorandum in Support of defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint pursuant to MASS. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Boston Police Department: Service through person in charge / agent; (E-filed 04/03/2022) | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants City of Boston, Officer John Doe #1, Officer John Doe #2's Notice of Motion to dismiss | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Nieve Anjomi, Esq. added for Defendant Officer John Doe #2 | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Nieve Anjomi, Esq. added for Defendant Officer John Doe #1 | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Nieve Anjomi, Esq. added for Defendant City of Boston | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Officer John Doe #1: Service accepted by counsel via e-mail; (Filed on 03/14/2022) | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant City of Boston: Service accepted by counsel via e-mail- (Filed 03/15/2022) | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Officer John Doe #2: Service accepted by counsel via e-mail; (Filed on 03/14/2022) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.