Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lmh-Lane Cabot Yard Joint Venture, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Mcnamara, Esq., John J, against Mass. Electric Construction Co., represented by Burwood, Esq., Jonathan Christopher, Carver, Esq., Bradford R, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts with Michael D. Ricciuti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael D. Ricciuti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryBusiness Litigation |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 03, 2021Plaintiff Lmh-Lane Cabot Yard Joint Venture's Application to stay arbitration
Date: September 03, 2021Plaintiff Lmh-Lane Cabot Yard Joint Venture's Motion for order of notice
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT It is Ordered and Adjudged Plffs Application to stay Arbitration is DENIED entered on docket pursuant to Mass R Civ P 58(a) and notice sent to parties pursuant to Mass R Civ P 77(d) Judge: Ricciuti, Hon. Michael D | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM & ORDER: OF DECISION ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO STAY ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO G.L. c.251, Sec.2(b): ORDER - Plaintiff's application to stay arbitration is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Dated: September 21, 2021 Notice sent 9/22/21 (See P#8 for complete decision) Judge: Ricciuti, Hon. Michael D | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply to Mass. Electric Construction Co.'s ("MEC") Opposition to LMH-Lane's Application to Stay Arbitration | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 09/14/2021 02:30 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Michael D Ricciuti, Presiding Staff: Brenda Shisslak, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ricciuti, Michael D |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to plaintiff's Application to stay Arbitration Pursuant to G.L.c.251s2(b) filed by Mass. Electric Construction Co. | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Applies To: Mass. Electric Construction Co. (Defendant) | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Jonathan Christopher Burwood, Esq. added for Defendant Mass. Electric Construction Co. | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Bradford R Carver, Esq. added for Defendant Mass. Electric Construction Co. | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and order of notice issued on a Motion for Stay of Application of Arbitration, returnable on 09/14/2021 02:30 PM Motion Hearing. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.