Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Forest High Llc, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Broadley, Esq., Steven S, against Burst.It Inc, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER: Procedural Order See paper #4 (9/30/22) (Notice sent 10/4/22)
Date: September 30, 2022Original civil complaint filed.
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) without prejudice | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER: Procedural Order See paper #4 (9/30/22) (Notice sent 10/4/22) | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Burst.It Inc: Service through person in charge / agent; (Filed on 10/08/2021) | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Note: 9/3/21 One Summon by mail | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 09/03/2021 | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Early Case Management Conference Pilot Program. | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Steven S Broadley, Esq. added for Plaintiff Forest High LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.