Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Akelius Us, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Batastini, Esq., Armando E, Rauseo-Ricupero, Esq., Ronaldo, against Corporation Does 1-25, Crystal Window & Door Systems, Ltd., Glennco Construction Co., Inc, John Moriarty & Associates, Inc., Manganaro Northeast, Llc, (total of 8) See All represented by Benham, Esq., Susan M, Cabral, Esq., Michael B, Hermes, Esq., Peter G, Naide, Esq., Kenneth Harris, Ryan, Esq., Patrick Timothy, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 02, 2021Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal (filed 3/8/22) as to plff vs defts and crossclaims with prejudice and with all parties to bear its own costs and attys fees and all rights of appeal waived JUDGMENT entered on docket pursuant to Mass R Civ P 58(a) as amend edand notice sent to parties pursuant to Mass R Civ P 77(d) Applies To: Akelius Us, Llc (Plaintiff); John Moriarty & Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Glennco Construction Co., Inc (Defendant); Manganaro Northeast, Llc (Defendant); Sk&i Architectural Design Group, Llc (Defendant); Crystal Window & Door Systems, Ltd. (Defendant); The Thompson & Lichtner Co., Inc. (Defendant); P.j. Spillane Company, Inc. (Defendant); Corporation Does 1-25 (Defendant) | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 03/09/2022 02:45 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Christine M Roach, Presiding Staff: Melissa Doris, Assistant Clerk Magistrate | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Motion Hearing to Amend Complaint scheduled on: 03/09/2022 02:45 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Christine M Roach, Presiding Staff: Melissa Doris, Assistant Clerk Magistrate | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion of Continue Motion Hearing (#33.0): ALLOWED (dated 2/15/22) notice sent 2/17/22 | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Akelius Us, Llc's Assented to Motion to continue / reschedule an event 02/16/2022 02:00 PM Motion Hearing to Amend Complaint | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 02/15/2022 16:05:38 | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 02/15/2022 16:02:27 | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 02/16/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Christine M Roach, Presiding Staff: Melissa Doris, Assistant Clerk Magistrate | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 02/15/2022 15:56:30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.