Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rehabilitation, Pope, Rehab, Pope, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts Norfolk County Probate and Family Court with Gorman, Hon. Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGorman, Hon. Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseNorfolk County Probate and Family Court |
Petition for Formal Probate
Date: June 15, 2021Citation Filed; Served as Ordered
Date: August 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 08/18/2021, by Hon. Patricia Gorman | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree and Order of Formal Probate | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 08/19/2021 08:37:32 | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Administrative Review scheduled on: 08/09/2021 10:51 AM Has been: Administrative Judicial For the following reason: Court Action Comments: DCR approved administratively Hon. Patricia Gorman, Presiding
Judge: Gorman, Patricia |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Citation on Petition for Formal Adjudication issued for unsupervised administration to be published in Weymouth News. | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Formal Probate | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order/Decree |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.