Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Moy, Bernice A., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts Norfolk County Probate and Family Court with Moses, Kimberly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoses, Kimberly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseNorfolk County Probate and Family Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion To Amend Devisees | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion To Amend Devisees ALLOWED on 11/18/2021 File Reference # 13 | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree and Order of Formal Probate Judge: Moses, Hon. Kimberly
Judge: Moses, Kimberly |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 11/17/2021, by Unassigned | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 11/18/2021 11:44:17 | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Disclaimer of Bernice A Moy, Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Moy Applies To: Moy, Bernice A. (Petitioner) | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Administrative Review scheduled on: 10/29/2021 10:47 AM Has been: Administrative Judicial Comments: see tickler Hon. Kimberly Moses, Presiding
Judge: Moses, Kimberly |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Citation on Petition for Formal Adjudication issued for unsupervised administration to be published in Randolph Herald. | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order/Decree |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.