Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sullivan, Mary C., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts Norfolk County Probate and Family Court with Gorman, Hon. Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGorman, Hon. Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseNorfolk County Probate and Family Court |
Notice of Informal Probate
Date: May 26, 2021ERROR
Date: May 26, 2021Proposed Order/Decree
Date: May 26, 2021Bond without Sureties
Date: May 26, 2021Devisees
Date: May 26, 2021Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: May 26, 2021Will date 1/12/21 - 14 Pages *** Received the original will on 5/28/21
Date: May 26, 2021Petition for Informal Probate
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 11/29/2022 11:09:57 | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Informal Probate of Will and/or Appointment of Personal Representative Signed 7/12/21 | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 07/12/2021, by Unassigned | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 07/26/2021 15:32:53 | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Resulted: Administrative Review scheduled on: 06/08/2021 09:00 AM Has been: Order Issued Unassigned, Presiding | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Informal Probate | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Mary C. Sullivan Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ERROR | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Kathleen Lynch Moncata Received the original affidavit on 5/28/21 | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order/Decree |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.