Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cushman, Charles, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Harrington, Esq., Daniel Michael, against Valukis, Richard, represented by Prokos, Esq., Frank, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Joseph F. Leighton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph F. Leighton, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal Plaintiff, Charles Cushman, only, hereby agrees to dismiss all claims against the Defendant, Richard Valukis, said dismissal to be made with prejudice and without costs. All other claims asserted by the other interested parties in this matter are to remain pending (efiled 10/6/23) mc Applies To: Prokos, Esq., Frank (Attorney) on behalf of Valukis, Richard (Defendant); Harrington, Esq., Daniel Michael (Attorney) on behalf of Cushman, Charles (Plaintiff) | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant Valukis, Richard: Dismissed by agreement of parties; | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial ORDER: After a pretrial conference on May 23,2023 the Court ORDERS: Trial with jury is scheduled for January 3,2024 at 9:00am; For good cause, Final Trial Conference is continued to December 19,2023 at 3:00pm; All trial submissions shall be filed by December 12,2023 after complying with Rule 9A; Deadline for Expert disclosure is July 27,2023 (Leighton, J)(dated; 5/23/23) ns pl Judge: Leighton, Hon. Joseph
Judge: Leighton, Joseph |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduled: Event: Jury Trial Date: 01/03/2024 Time: 09:00 AM | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 05/23/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: Zoom; FTR Room 10 -start time of 2:02:12 Hon. Joseph Leighton, Presiding
Judge: Leighton, Joseph |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: dg | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Emailed zoom information to counsel | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date James L Roberti, Esq. added for Other interested party Kevin Coady | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Blake Driscolli, Esq. added for Other interested party Ronald Z Symolon | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference on Tuesday, May 23, 2023 at 2:00 P.M. along with the Consolidated cases of 2282cv420 and 2182cv482 Sent On: 12/27/2022 12:37:40 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.