Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Epp, William, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lee, Esq., Amber Nicole, Moeslinger, Esq., Raven, against Cavallaro, Anthony F., Jaca Architects, Inc., represented by Kearney, Esq., Richard W, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: June 16, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: June 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Raven Moeslinger, Esq. added for Plaintiff William Epp | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Amber Nicole Lee, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Plaintiff William Epp | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal "Pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii), all parties to the above-entitled action hereby stipulate that this case, including all claims, cross-claims, and counterclaims asserted or capable of being asserted herein, be dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. The parties further waive all rights of appeal. The parties request that this Stipulation of Dismissal be entered into the docket and thereafter dismiss the claims and counterclaims with prejudice." (Rec'd E-File 7/27/2022) Applies To: Kearney, Esq., Richard W (Attorney) on behalf of Jaca Architects, Inc. (Defendant); Lee, Esq., Amber Nicole (Attorney) on behalf of Epp, William (Plaintiff) | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (#15.0): Motion is ALLOWED by assent; Discovery deadline is extended up to and including July 11, 2022; R.56 Service deadline is August 10, 2022; Rule 56 Filing deadline is September 12, 2022 and a pre trial conference is to be scheduled in January 2023. cs | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff William Epp's Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (Rec'd 4/11/2022) | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Answer to the Second Amended Counterclaim (e-Filed 2/16/2022) | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED Counterclaim filed by Anthony F. Cavallaro against Willliam Epp | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion of Defendant Anthony Cavallaro for leave to file a Second Amended Counterclaim (#12.0): ALLOWED (Dated 1/24/2022) cs | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing (e-filed)(rec'd 1/20/22) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.