Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brody, Jason, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Deprospo, Jr., Esq., Anthony Louis, Dickman, Esq., Michael P, Sams, Esq., Michael Paul, against Kesington Place Llc, Mcdonough Building Inc, Mcdonough, Thomas, represented by Kenney, Esq., Stephen J, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Mark A. Hallal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Hallal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Jason Brody, Kesington Place LLC, Thomas McDonough, McDonough Building Inc's Joint Motion to Continue Final Pre Trial Conference | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference on Tuesday, July 18, 2023 at 2:00 P.M. CONFERENCE IS BY ZOOM VIDEO Meeting ID 161 303 8151 Sent On: 04/04/2023 13:16:52 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Received from Defendants Kesington Place LLC, Thomas McDonough and McDonough Building, Inc's Answer to Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (rec'd 12/2/22) | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Stephen J Kenney, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant McDonough Building Inc | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Stephen J Kenney, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Thomas McDonough | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation the parties that the undersigned counsel, on behalf of Defendants Kensington Place, LLC; McDonough Building, Inc. and Thomas McDonough, is authorized to accept Service of the Second Amended Complaint in this action. The undersigned counsel received a copy of the Second Amended Complaint on October 18, 2022 (e-Filed 10/19/2022) Applies To: Brody, Jason (Plaintiff); Kesington Place LLC (Defendant); McDonough, Thomas (Defendant); McDonough Building Inc (Defendant) | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to (#13.0): amend complaint. ALLOWED Mass. R. Civ. P 15 and G. L. c, 231, § 51permit this amendment. (dated 10/14/2022) ns ni | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended: SECOND amended complaint filed by Jason Brody | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (E-filed 9/28/2022) | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Jason Brody's Submission of list of documents (E-filed 9/28/2022) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.