Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ppg Industries, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Richmond, Esq., Laurence Kent, against 10 Sunnyside Ave Llc, Mikhael, George, represented by Savage, Esq., Michael E, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Mark A. Hallal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Hallal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: June 01, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: June 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Michael E Savage, Esq. added for Defendant 10 Sunnyside Ave LLC Doing Business as Alewife Auto Center | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal "Plaintiff and Defendant stipulate that all claims and counterclaims asserted in the above-captioned matter shall be dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party. All parties waive all rights of appeal. All parties waive notice under Rule 77." Applies To: PPG Industries, Inc. (Plaintiff); 10 Sunnyside Ave LLC Doing Business as Alewife Auto Center (Defendant); George Mikhael Also Known As E. Mikhael a/k/a Elias Mikhael (Defendant) | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 09/26/2023 cs | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Non-Jury Trial scheduled on: 08/09/2023 09:00 AM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Nancy J Delaney, Presiding | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 08/02/2023 02:30 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Nancy J Delaney, Presiding | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 08/02/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Mark A Hallal, Presiding
Judge: Hallal, Mark A |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial ORDER: Non-Jury Pretrial ORDER: See ORDER (Kirpalani, J)(dated;12/12/22) ns pl Judge: Kirpalani, Hon. Maynard
Judge: Kirpalani, Maynard |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial ORDER: After a pretrial conference on December 12,2022 the Court ORDERS: Trial without jury is scheduled for Wednesday, August 9,2023 at 9:00am; A final trial conference will be held on Wednesday, August 2,2023 at 2:00pm; Motions in limine pursuant to Superior Court Rule 9A shall be filed by July 28,2023 (Kirpalani, J)(dated; 12/12/22) ns pl Judge: Kirpalani, Hon. Maynard
Judge: Kirpalani, Maynard |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Scheduled: Event: Jury Trial Date: 08/09/2023 Time: 09:00 AM | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 12/12/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR - Ctrm. 3 Via Zoom Hon. Maynard Kirpalani, Presiding
Judge: Kirpalani, Maynard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.