Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Caprigno, Amy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jeffers, Esq., Diane M, against Xxxxxxxx, Xxxxxxx R., Xxxx, Jr., Xxxxxxx A., represented by Cassis, Esq., Louis Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Joseph F. Leighton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph F. Leighton, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of 93A complaint sent to Attorney General
Date: June 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal as to Amy Caprigno's original complaint the parties hereby stipulate that all claims in the above action shall be dismissed, with prejudice, without costs, with each party bearing their own fees and costs, and waiving all rights of appeal | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER: Re: No. 11.0 - Finding and Order for Approval of Attachment - Writ issued June 9th, 2021 returned as unserved. New writ to issue | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ Attachment, returned UNSERVED Writ returned from the Deputy Sheriff as not served as writ of attachment had expired Applies To: Jeffers, Esq., Diane M (Attorney) on behalf of Caprigno, Amy (Plaintiff) | |
July 10, 2021 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. Judge: Hickey, Mary K | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant xxxxxxxx, xxxxxxx R. and xxxx, Jr., xxxxxxx A.: Answer with claim for trial by jury | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Louis Anthony Cassis, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant xxxxxxx A. xxxx, Jr. | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Real Estate Attachment of property standing in the name of defendant, xxxxxxx R. xxxxxxxx. (#3.0): DENIED as to xxxxxxx xxxx. ALLOWED in part as to xxxxxxxxxxxxxxxx as follows: the Attachment is ALLOWED in the amount of $97,000.00. (dated 6/9/2021) ns ni | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Findings and Order for Approval of Plaintiff(s) Amy Caprigno's Motion (#3.0) for a Real Estate Attachment as to Defendant xxxxxxx R. xxxxxxxx in the amount of $97,000.00. Therefore, the court hereby approves attachment in the amount of $97,000.00 as to the real estate standing in the name of xxxxxxx R. xxxxxxxx in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (dated 6/11/2021) certified copies sent ni | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant xxxx, Jr., xxxxxxx A.: Service made in hand to Vera Spagnuolo (his mother in law) on 6/2/21 at 3:10PM; | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Louis Anthony Cassis, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant xxxxxxx R. xxxxxxxx |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.