Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Amaral, Jason, filed a(n) Administrative Civil Actions case represented by Pro Se, against Carol Mici, Commissioner Of The Doc, Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, Jennifer Redd, Disciplinary Hearing Officer, Nelson Alves, Superintendent Of Mci-Norfolk, represented by Cousins, Esq., Carlos E, Platt-Rutherford, Esq., Tonya E, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Maynard M. Kirpalani presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaynard M. Kirpalani Track Judgeโs New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL This action come on review on Defendants' Motion to dismiss for failure to make service of the complaint and summons before the Court, Mark Hallal, Associate Justice presiding, and the Motion having been allowed. IT IS ORDERED and ADJUDGED: that the complaint of plaintiff Jason Amaral against defendants' Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Carol A. Mici, Commissioner, Nelson Alves, Superintendent of MCI-Norfolk and Lt. Jennifer Redd, Hearing Officer be dismissed. (dated May 3, 2022) certified copies sent ni Judge: Delaney, Nancy J | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Submission of defendants' Limited Appearance Motion to dismiss for failure to make service of the complaint and summons. (#16.0): ALLOWED (dated 4/28/2022) ns ni Judge: Hallal, Hon. Mark A | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Tonya E Platt-Rutherford, Esq. added as Limited Appearance Counsel for Defendant Carol Mici, Commissioner of the DOC (efiled 3/17/22) | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Tonya E Platt-Rutherford, Esq. added as Limited Appearance Counsel for Defendant Nelson Alves, Superintendent of MCI-Norfolk (efiled 3/17/22) | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants Carol Mici, Commissioner of the DOC, Nelson Alves, Superintendent of MCI-Norfolk, Jennifer Redd, disciplinary hearing officer's Submission of limited appearance Motion to dismiss for failure to make service of the complaint and summons | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Tonya E Platt-Rutherford, Esq. added as Limited Appearance Counsel for Defendant Jennifer Redd, disciplinary hearing officer (efiled 3/17/22) | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for judgment on the pleadings MRCP 12(c) (#14.0): DENIED as Moot. See endorsement on p#13.0 Defendants shall comply with scheduling order 1-96 by February 28,2022 (Wilkins, J)(dated; 1/18/22) ns pl Judge: Wilkins, Hon. Douglas H | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to dismiss certain counts (#13.0): ALLOWED without opposition as to claims against the Commonwealth under 42 U.S.C ยง1983, declaratory judgment, equitable relief and attorneys fees only. The complaint shall proceed against all other defendants and in addition shall proceed as a certiorari action against the Department of Correction (Wilkins, J) (dated; 1/18/22) ns pl Judge: Wilkins, Hon. Douglas H | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Letter from Plaintiff Jason Amaral RE: defendant's Emergency motion to stay | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Commonwealth of Massachusetts's EMERGENCY Motion to stay Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings pending resolution of the Commonwealth's Unopposed Motion to dismiss (efiled 12/6/21) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.