Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Menyo, Sandra, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Devlin, Esq., Ryan A, against Seaberg, Abigail, Seaberg, Donald, represented by Merlino, Esq., Joseph A, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal as to Sandra Menyo's original complaint the parties hereby stipulate that said action and all cross claims and/or counter claims be dismissed with prejudice and without costs (efiled 3/2/22) | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Seaberg, Donald: Service made in hand at work on 6/15/21 at 46 East Street Plainville, MA (rec'd 6/23/21) | |
July 10, 2021 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. Judge: Hickey, Mary K | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Defendants Seaberg, Abigail and Seaberg, Donald: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendants files Uniform Counsel Certification. Applies To: Seaberg, Abigail (Defendant); Seaberg, Donald (Defendant) | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Joseph A Merlino, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Donald Seaberg | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Joseph A Merlino, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Abigail Seaberg | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.