Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Labyrinth Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Rosemary Connolly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRosemary Connolly Track Judgeโs New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER: Order Approving Voluntary Assignment of Lottery Prize Payments (dated June 29, 2021) certified copies sent ni Judge: Connolly, Hon. Rosemary
Judge: Connolly, Rosemary |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Complaint After Zoom hearing; Petition is Approved. See Order. (dated June 29, 2021) ns ni Judge: Connolly, Hon. Rosemary
Judge: Connolly, Rosemary |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Evidentiary Hearing scheduled on: 06/29/2021 12:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: Zoom; FTR Room 10 -start time of 12:22:17 Hon. Rosemary Connolly, Presiding
Judge: Connolly, Rosemary |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for a Zoom evidentiary hearing for the approval of voluntary assignment of Lottery Prize Payments; hearing to be held on June 29, 2021 at 12:00P.M. Sent On: 06/15/2021 13:31:44 Notice Sent To: Douglas M Evans, Esq. Kroll, McNamara, Evans and Delehanty, LLP 65 Memorial Rd Suite 300, West Hartford, CT 06107 Notice Sent To: The Massachusetts State Lottery Commission 150 Mount Vernon Street, Boston, MA 02125 Notice Sent To: Asellus Receivables II, LLC 2255 Glades Road Suite 100E, Boca Raton, FL 33431 Notice Sent To: Anthony L. Caputo 59 Alwin Place, Springfield, MA 01128 | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Court Order approving voluntary assignment of lottery prize payments | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 05/26/2021 | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Douglas M Evans, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Petitioner Labyrinth Funding LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.