Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Murray, Joseph, filed a(n) Miscellaneous Civil Actions case in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Mark A. Hallal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Hallal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
|
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Petition to secure documents pursuant to M.G.L chapter 223A section 9(a) (#1.0): ALLOWED after full Zoom hearing and review. See Order of this date (Hallal, J)(dated;9/1/21) ns pl Judge: Hallal, Hon. Mark A | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER: COURT ORDER: Said Records are for IN CAMERA review by Judge Montalbano in the First Instance (Hallal, J)(dated;9/1/21) certified copy sent pl Judge: Hallal, Hon. Mark A | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing scheduled on: 09/01/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR Ct rm #3, start 2:23, end 2:28:20, jph, a.c. Hon. Mark A Hallal, Presiding
Judge: Hallal, Mark A |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Zoom hearing on petitioner's Request for Treatment Records. Hearing to be held on September 1, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. Copy of Zoom invitation attached. Sent On: 08/19/2021 10:37:31 Notice Sent To: David Ellison, Esq. Law Office of David Ellison 1000 Chapel View Blvd Suite 260, Cranston, RI 02920 | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Joseph Murray's Memorandum (SUPPLEMENTAL) in support of petition. (received 8/6/2021) | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Petition to secure documents pursuant to M.G.L.Chapter 233A, Section 9(a) | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 05/26/2021 | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date David Ellison, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Petitioner Joseph Murray |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.