Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Yanoff, Randy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Chistolini, Esq., John A, Desimone, Esq., Mafalda Marie, against Camacho-Dasilva, Kory, Johns Sewer & Pipe Cleaning, Inc., represented by Schranze, Esq., Bernard W, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Joseph F. Leighton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph F. Leighton, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2020 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Randy Yanoff, Johns Sewer & Pipe Cleaning, Inc., Kory Camacho-Dasilva's original complaint | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend Discovery Deadline. (#10.0): Motion is ALLOWED as assented to in that Discovery is extended to 12/1/2021; Rule 56 service deadline is extended to 1/2/2022; Rule 56 filing deadline is extended to 2/12/2022 and the case shall be scheduled for a final pre-trial conference in April 2022. (dated 6/9/2021) ns ni Judge: Leighton, Hon. Joseph
Judge: Leighton, Joseph |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Randy Yanoff's Joint Motion to extend discovery deadline | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John A Chistolini, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Randy Yanoff | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion of Defendants' to release Medical Records of the Plaintiff Randy Yanoff (#9.0): DENIED without prejudice to refile with a proper Order excluding ALL privileged materials, not just those under G.L. c. 111 s119 (see, e.g G.L.C 12,s.172A) (Dated 3/4/2021) cs | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A (rec'd 2/26/21) Applies To: Schranze, Esq., Bernard W (Attorney) on behalf of Camacho-Dasilva, Kory, Johns Sewer & Pipe Cleaning, Inc. (Defendant) | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. (rec'd 2/26/21) | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing (rec'd 2/26/21) | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Brief filed: in support of Defendants' Motion to release Medical Records of Plaintiff, Randy Yanoff (rec'd 2/26/21) Applies To: Johns Sewer & Pipe Cleaning, Inc. (Defendant); Camacho-Dasilva, Kory (Defendant) | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendants(s) Johns Sewer & Pipe Cleaning, Inc., Kory Camacho-Dasilva motion filed to releaseMedical Records of Plaintiff, Randy Yanoff (rec'd 2/26/21) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.