Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Postle, Dawn, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Doyle, Jr., Esq., William Joseph, against Allied Physical Therapy & Rehabilitation Inc, represented by Lucey, Esq., Jeanette Marie, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Diane C. Freniere presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane C. Freniere Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Dawn Postle's original complaint all claims, counterclaims, cross-claims and third-party claims alleged or asserted herein dismissed with prejudice, without costs and with all rights of appeal waived (rec'd 5/28/19) | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: William Joseph Doyle, Jr., Esq. Attorney: Jeanette Marie Lucey, Esq. | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 05/24/2019 cs | |
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 04/30/2019 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon Diane Freniere, Presiding
Judge: Freniere, Diane |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 04/23/2019 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon Diane Freniere, Presiding
Judge: Freniere, Diane |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial ORDER: After a pretrial conference on September 5,2018 the Court ORDERS: All motions in limine be filed with the Court via 9A no later than Friday April 19, 2019 along with any proposed voir dire an updated JOINT witness list, an agreed upon description of the case an agreed upon exhibit list :Mediation if any to occur by Wednesday,, March 20th, 2019; final Trial conference is scheduled for Tuesday, April 23,2019 at 2:00pm for a hearing on motions in limine and all other pretrial matters; Trial is scheduled for Tuesday, April 30,2019 at 9:00am and is estimated to run 4 days (Freniere, J)(dated;10/18/18) ns pl Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane
Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/05/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon Diane Freniere, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Freniere, Diane |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend time for discovery (#9.0): ALLOWED for a brief, further extension. This is the parties' second request to extend discovery. (See Docket #7.0). Discovery and other tracking deadlines to be extended by 45 days only, and final pre-trial conference to be held the week of September 3 - 7, 2018. Discovery deadline is extended up to and including September 4, 2018. Pre-trial conference is continued to September 5, 2018. (dated 7/20/18) notice sent dl Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane
Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 07/24/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon Diane Freniere, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Freniere, Diane |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.