Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Stone, Stephen, filed a(n) Civil Actions With Incarcerated Party case represented by Pro Se, against Massachusetts State Police, represented by Isley, Esq., Kate R, Tang, Esq., Yeatyng Evelyn, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Sullivan, William F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSullivan, William F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryCivil Actions With Incarcerated Party |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion of Plaintiff to Default the Defendant; After hearing and review, (#20.0): DENIED See Memorandum and Order of this date. (Dated 4/12/2021) cs | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to dismiss all counts of Plaintiff's Complaint; After hearing and review of the parties' submissions, (#13.0): ALLOWED See Memorandum of Decision and Order of this date. (Dated 4/12/2021) cs | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: That the Complaint of the Plaintiff Stephen Stone, against the Defendant Massachusetts State Police is DISMISSED. (Dated 4/14/2021) cs (Certified copies mailed) | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: --Memorandum of Decision and Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint / Join Party. (Dated 4/12/2021) cs Judge: Sullivan, Hon. William F CERTIFIED COPIES MAILED
Judge: Sullivan, William F |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to amend the complaint /Joint Party II; After hearing and review, Plaintiff's Motion to Amend to join a party is (#17.0): DENIED without prejudice. See Memorandum of Decision and Order of this date. (Dated 4/12/2021) cs | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 12/01/2020 11:00 AM Has been: Held - Under advisement Comments: FTR - Ctrm. 3 Via Zoom Hon. William F Sullivan, Presiding
Judge: Sullivan, William F |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial ORDER: The hearing on Defendant's Motion To Dismiss (p.#13.0), Plaintiff's Motion To Amend Complaint/Join Party (p.#14.0) and Plaintiff's Motion To Default A Party (p.#20.0) originally set for November 23, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. is res-scheduled for Tuesday, December 1, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. due to the unavailability of the "B" Session Judge on the originally assigned date. The hearing shall be conducted via Zoom. c.s. | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 11/23/2020 11:00 AM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. William F Sullivan, Presiding
Judge: Sullivan, William F |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for hearing on November 23,2020 at 11;00am before Judge Sullivan regarding p.#13.0 Deft's Motion To Dismiss p.#14.0 Plttf's...Motion To Amend Complaint/Join Party p.#20.0 Pltff's Motion To Default A Partyp.#13.0 Deft's Motion To Dismiss **Hearing to be conducted by Zoom Conference** Sent On: 11/02/2020 13:30:03 Notice Sent To: Kate R Isley, Esq. Office of the Attorney General One Ashburton Place Rm 1813, Boston, MA 02108 Notice Sent To: Yeatyng Evelyn Tang, Esq. Office of the Attorney General Trial Division 18th Floor One Ashburton Place, Boston, MA 02108 Notice Sent To: Stephen Stone 146 Old Webster Road, Oxford, MA 01540 | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Reinstate Case - Joint Motion to Reinstate to docket - effectively to remove prior stay of proceedings is (#25.0): ALLOWED (dated 8/28/20) notice sent dl Judge: Connors, Hon. Thomas A
Judge: Thomas AConnors |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.