Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lucas, Jackson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lacet, Esq., Jovan J, against Banville, Danielle A, represented by Garrity, Esq., Michael, Valentino, Esq., Paul, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Thomas A. Connors presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas A. Connors Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Received from Defendant Banville, Danielle A: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: February 07, 2017JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. cs
Date: November 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. cs | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Jovan J Lacet, Esq. Attorney: Paul Valentino, Esq. Attorney: Michael Garrity, Esq. | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 10/19/2018 cs Judge: Connors, Hon. Thomas A
Judge: Thomas AConnors |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 09/19/2018 09:00 AM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Nancy J Delaney, Presiding Appeared: Staff: | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/17/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR - Ctrm. 3 Hon. Thomas A Connors, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Connors, Thomas A |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial ORDER: After a Final Trial Conference on September 12,2018 the Court ORDERS: The Final Trial Conference is continued to Monday, September 17,2018 at 2:00pm. Failure of plaintiff to appear shall result in dismissal of the case for want of prosecution (Connors, J)(dated;9/12/18) ns pl Judge: Connors, Hon. Thomas A
Judge: Thomas AConnors |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Defendant Danielle A Banville's Motion in limine to preclude plaintiff's introduction and testimony of lost earnings (re'cd9/12/18) | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Defendant Danielle A Banville's Motion in limine to preclude plaintiff's introduction of medical records and charges (rec'd 9/12/18) | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Paul Valentino, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Danielle A Banville | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/12/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR - Ctrm. 3 Only deft csl appeared. Hon. Thomas A Connors, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Connors, Thomas A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.