Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Swicker, Peter, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wozniak, Esq., John M, against A2Z Realty Inspections Inc, represented by Gaynor, Esq., Robert H, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Gregg J. Pasquale presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregg J. Pasquale Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Peter Swicker's original complaint against the Defendant A2Z Realty Inspections, Inc., d/b/a Pillar to Post | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (#10.0): ALLOWED Discovery deadline is extended up to and including February 28, 2018. (dated 12/7/17) notice sent dl Judge: Pasquale, Hon. Gregg J
Judge: Gregg JPasquale |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Original of p#10.0 Joint motion to extend tracking order deadlines(rec'd 12/4/17) | |
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Peter Swicker's Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (fax) | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Peter Swicker's Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) ORIGINAL P#8.0 (received 10/16/2017) | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Peter Swicker's Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (fax) | |
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Status review notice returned Parties are currently finishing discovery in ths matter. (rec'd 9/11/17) Applies To: Gaynor, Esq., Robert H (Attorney) on behalf of A2Z Realty Inspections Inc Doing Business as Pillar to Post (Defendant) | |
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Status review notice returned Parties presently finishing discovery (rec'd 9/7/17) Applies To: Wozniak, Esq., John M (Attorney) on behalf of Swicker, Peter (Plaintiff) | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 09/18/2017 the complaint will be dismissed. | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Robert H Gaynor, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant A2Z Realty Inspections Inc Doing Business as Pillar to Post |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.