Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Long, Charles, Long, Christine, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Cabral, Esq., Michael B, Ugino, Esq., Jeffery D, against Ranieri, Jonathan, Ranieri, Meaghan, Royer Tree Service Inc, represented by Farrey Iii, Thomas B, Haverty, Esq., John W, Seliger, Brooke P, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Original civil complaint filed. (filed in Land Court 7/1/2016) (received 12/16/2016)
Date: December 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Charles Long's original complaint and all right of appeal waived | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Response to Ranieri Defendants' Statement of facts filed by Charles Long, Christine Long(filed in Land Court 10/5/2016) (received 12/16/2016) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Charles Long, Christine Long's Memorandum in opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (filed in Land Court 11/7/2016) (received 12/16/2016) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. (filed in Land Court 7/1/2016) (received 12/16/2016) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Certified Docket Sheet from Land Court Department regarding case 16MISC000368 (received 12/16/2016) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM & ORDER: to Transfer to Superior Court (Foster, J. from Land Court signed 12/13/2016) (received 12/16/2016) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Charles Long, Christine Long(filed in Land Court 11/7/2016) (received 12/16/2016) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Material Facts (filed in Land Court 11/7/2016) (received 12/16/2016) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Response to Defendant, Royer Tree Service Inc's statement of facts filed by Charles Long, Christine Long (filed in Land Court 11/7/2016) (received 12/16/2016) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.