Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Old Republic Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gauvin, Esq., Julie E, Postl, Esq., John O, against Andrea, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Diane C. Freniere presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane C. Freniere Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Execution issued on the judgment dated 09/06/2018, (#13.0) against the following party(s): Old Republic Insurance Company in favor of Michael Andrea. In the amount of Judgment total of $184,515.63, Post Judgment interest in the sum of $2,488.93 for an execution total in the sum of $187,004.56. Mailed to John Postl, P.C. at 35 Kingston Street, 2nd Floor, Boston, MA 02111 Judge: Hickey, Mary K
Judge: Mary KHickey |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for execution Applies To: Postl, Esq., John O (Attorney) on behalf of Old Republic Insurance Company (Plaintiff) | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Presiding: Hon Diane Freniere Judgment For: Old Republic Insurance Company Judgment Against: Michael Andrea Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 09/06/2018 Jdgmnt Date: 09/06/2018 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 184178.00 Filing Fees: 275.00 Costs Pd to Court: 5.00 Other Costs: 57.63 Judgment Total: 184,515.63 Further Orders: The $184,178.00 figure includes the principal amount due on the promissory note in the sum of $149,000.00; interest in the sum of $34,178.00 and attorneys fees in the sum of $1,000.00(cs) | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER: MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER ON ASSESSMENT OF DAMAGES: ORDER: Judgment shall enter for the Plaintiff(s) in the sum of $184,178.00. Dated 9/5/2018. Notices mailed 9/6/2018. Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane
Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Original note filed 08/23/2018 in the amount of $149,000.00 | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for assessment of damages (#9.0): Other action taken Plaintiff to file original note or make argument to substitute note. Court will then assess the damages as were presented at this hearing. (dated 8/7/18) notice sent dl Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane
Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled on: 08/07/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon Diane Freniere, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Freniere, Diane |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Notice of Hearing on Assessment of Damages scheduled for 8/7/2018 sent to Michael Andrea on 7/10/2018 (Rec'd. 7/12/2018) | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date David Alexander Barrett, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Plaintiff Old Republic Insurance Company (rec'd 7/9/18) | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER: Notice sent for Assessment of Damages hearing on Tuesday, August 7, 2018, Judge Freniere Presiding, Court Room 20 at 2:00 PM Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane
Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.