Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Desrosiers, Emmanuel, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Smith, Esq., Gregory T, against J.F Trocki Landscape And Design Inc, Universal Management Inc, represented by Fay, Esq., Thomas J, Joyce, Esq., Michael C, Sullivan, Esq., Joshua, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 14, 2016Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/14/2016 (SENT TO ATTORNEY)
Date: December 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Emmanuel Desrosiers's original complaint including crossclaims | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | P#6.0 Crossclaim filed (received 1/19/2017) | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Thomas J Fay, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Universal Management Inc | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Universal Management Inc: Answer with crossclaim; (received 1/19/2017) Applies To: Universal Management Inc (Defendant) | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Michael C. Joyce, Esq. added for Defendant Universal Management Inc | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Universal Management Inc: Service made in hand; to Joanna Grey, agent and person in charge at the time of service for Universal Management Inc as c/o Stuart R. Levey, registered agent on 12/29/2016 at 1:20pm Applies To: Universal Management Inc (Defendant) | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED in hand to John F. Trocki, president, person in charge at the time of service on 12/27/2016 at 3:59pm Applies To: J.F Trocki Landscape and Design Inc (Defendant) | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant J.F Trocki Landscape and Design Inc: Answer to original complaint; Applies To: J.F Trocki Landscape and Design Inc (Defendant) | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Joshua Sullivan, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant J.F Trocki Landscape and Design Inc | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.