Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Eastern Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Holland, Esq., Lisa Marie, against Madden, Christopher R, Mary Mcgrath, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT authorizing the foreclosure of a mortgage. filed 4/27/2017 Applies To: Madden, Christopher R (Defendant); Mary McGrath Also Known As Mary C. McGrath (Defendant) | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant Mary McGrath Also Known As Mary C. McGrath: Defaulted - Foreclosure; | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant Madden, Christopher R: Defaulted - Foreclosure; | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Eastern Bank Successor By Merger To The Community Bank's Motion to take the complaint for confessed - Allowed (Connors, RAJ) | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | other document, returned SERVED Order of notice: Christopher R. Madden served on 3/8/2017 by leaving at l & u, Mary McGrath served on 3/8/2017 by leaving at l & u Applies To: Madden, Christopher R (Defendant); Mary McGrath Also Known As Mary C. McGrath (Defendant) | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER: of notice issued with a March 28, 2017 return date | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to issue new order of notice for service only (#4.0): ALLOWED Motion allowed in that a new Order of Notice for service only shall issue with a return date of March 28, 2017 | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Defendant Christopher R Madden, Mary McGrath Also Known As Mary C. McGrath is not in the Military recd 2/9/2017 | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Status report pursuant to Service members Civil Relief Act as of 2/7/2017 Mary McGrath and Christopher Madden - N/A recd 2/9/2017 | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding status report pursuant to service members civil relief act as of 12/8/2016 N/A as to Mary McGrath and Christopher Madden recd 2/9/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.