Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Tassinari, Jr., John, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Beagan, Esq., Sean M, against Building Association Of The Wm. B. Dalton American Legion Inc, represented by Carter, Esq., Jason W, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Amended: original complaint filed by John Tassinari, Jr. (rec'd 1/10/17)
Date: January 25, 2017Received from Defendant Tassinari, Jr., John: Answer to the Counterclaim. (rec'd 2/15/17)
Date: February 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to John Tassinari, Jr.'s original complaint (rec'd 10/30/17) | |
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Sean M Beagan, Esq. Attorney: Jason W Carter, Esq. | |
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 11/13/2017 | |
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event (#21.0): ALLOWED (dated 8/17/17) noltice sent dl | |
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant John Tassinari, Jr., Building Association of the WM. B. Dalton American Legion Inc's Assented to Motion to Continue Matter Until August 22, 2017 (FAX) | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for good cause shown (#16.0): ALLOWED However, deposition is strictly limited to whether the parties reached an agreement to purchase and sell the real estate, and not to any matters after such allowed agreement was reached. As discovery is on an expedited basis, deposition to be conducted by August 11, 2017. (dated 7/20/17) notice sent dl | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding original of P #17.0 Affidavit in support of plaintiff's further opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss (rec'd 7/17/17) | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Original of P #16.0 - plaintiff's motion to permit further discovery (rec'd 7/17/17) | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Opposition to to plaintiff's request for further discovery. (fax) filed by Applies To: Carter, Esq., Jason W. (Attorney) on behalf of Building Association of the WM. B. Dalton American Legion Inc (Defendant) | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Sean M. Beagan in support of Plaintiff's Further Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (rec'd 7/12/17) (email) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.